+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate