+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/6/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/31/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor