+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor