+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor