+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate