+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (77)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House grants request for conference committee
- Motion to instruct conferees
- House appoints conferees
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Motion fails
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to table fails
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/1/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/27/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor