+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Urban Affairs
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor