+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor