+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor