+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Rules suspended
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Co-author authorized
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor