+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor