+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Left pending in subcommittee
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor