+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor