+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (80)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor