+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor