+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate