+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate