+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor