+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On December 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor