+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Reported engrossed
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate