+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (74)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
- Referred to Pensions
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Reported engrossed
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor