+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor