+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 2nd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor