+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor