+ − Actions (62)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Read 2nd time
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor