+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in subcommittee
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On December 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate