+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (109)
On September 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Point of order sustained
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
On August 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On August 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On August 24, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
- Meeting cancelled
On August 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment fails of adoption
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 8/9/2021
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On August 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor