+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (111)
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed as amended
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/7/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/6/2021
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/23/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor