+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Point of order sustained
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Rules suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate