+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor