+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor