+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/23/2019
- Posting rule suspended
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor