+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion withdrawn
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor