+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Education
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor