+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor