+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Rereferred to committee
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate