+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/5/2021
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/7/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate