+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor