+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (76)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 1/1/16
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Business & Industry
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate