+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor