+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate