+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/11/2021
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/12/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor