+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Corrections
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate