+ − Actions (57)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor