+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Education
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate