+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor