+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor