+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Motion withdrawn
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Motion to suspend three day rule
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor