+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate