+ − Actions (49)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Passed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate